Welcome to the Imperial Archives! The main source of information in the Galactic Empire. Be sure to check out the Editing Protocol before making new pages or editing articles. If you need help feel free to contact the Archives manager at archives@swc-empire.com !
Recent changes
Track the most recent changes to the wiki on this page.
17 September 2024
10:00 | Navarro de Molay (2 changes | history) . . (+1,081) . . [Navarro de Molay (2×)] | |
10:00 (cur | prev) . . (+49) . . Navarro de Molay (talk | contribs) | ||
m | 09:55 (cur | prev) . . (+1,032) . . Navarro de Molay (talk | contribs) (Citation placeholder) |
15 September 2024
20:33 | Aldric Herber (diff | hist) . . (+520) . . Aldric Herber (talk | contribs) |
12 September 2024
15:42 | Janus Wulff (7 changes | history) . . (+245) . . [Janus Wulff (7×)] | |
15:42 (cur | prev) . . (0) . . Janus Wulff (talk | contribs) | ||
15:36 (cur | prev) . . (+22) . . Janus Wulff (talk | contribs) (→Career Highlights) | ||
15:20 (cur | prev) . . (+8) . . Janus Wulff (talk | contribs) (→General Information) | ||
15:19 (cur | prev) . . (+158) . . Janus Wulff (talk | contribs) (→Ranks) | ||
13:27 (cur | prev) . . (+26) . . Janus Wulff (talk | contribs) (→General Information) | ||
13:05 (cur | prev) . . (-16) . . Janus Wulff (talk | contribs) | ||
13:03 (cur | prev) . . (+47) . . Janus Wulff (talk | contribs) |
10 September 2024
m 23:12 | Patrick Bisson (diff | hist) . . (+148) . . Patrick Bisson (talk | contribs) |
9 September 2024
N 17:56 | Thorne Valis (diff | hist) . . (+6,479) . . Thorne Valis (talk | contribs) (Created page with "{{Template:CharacterBoxGold |image= https://custom.swcombine.com/static/1/1480443-100-100.jpg |name= Thorne Valis |race= Coruscanti |homeworld= Coruscant |mother= Alyna Valis...") |
Nm 17:27 | User talk:Thorne Valis (diff | hist) . . (+326) . . Ikurei Serper (talk | contribs) (Welcome!) |
m 15:57 | Alani Myrtel (diff | hist) . . (+87) . . Alani Myrtel (talk | contribs) (host change) |
15:09 | Athrun Zala (2 changes | history) . . (-705) . . [Alani Myrtel (2×)] | |
15:09 (cur | prev) . . (-248) . . Alani Myrtel (talk | contribs) (restored watermarked images) | ||
14:55 (cur | prev) . . (-457) . . Alani Myrtel (talk | contribs) (→Awards: replaced photobucket awards with non-watermark ones) |
13:59 | Janus Wulff (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Janus Wulff (talk | contribs) |
13:42 | Ninian DeLayn (2 changes | history) . . (-126) . . [Alani Myrtel (2×)] | |
13:42 (cur | prev) . . (+3) . . Alani Myrtel (talk | contribs) (→Navy Ranks: added unbroken versions of ranks) | ||
13:11 (cur | prev) . . (-129) . . Alani Myrtel (talk | contribs) (Added non-broken versions of old awards) |
8 September 2024
m 16:30 | Alani Myrtel (3 changes | history) . . (+627) . . [Alani Myrtel (3×)] | |
m | 16:30 (cur | prev) . . (-493) . . Alani Myrtel (talk | contribs) (removed remnant of test) | |
m | 09:15 (cur | prev) . . (+383) . . Alani Myrtel (talk | contribs) | |
m | 08:22 (cur | prev) . . (+737) . . Alani Myrtel (talk | contribs) (→Imperial Service Record: IAM and minor table changes) |
7 September 2024
m 22:37 | Elsyn Voss (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Elsyn Voss (talk | contribs) (→Qualifications) |
4 September 2024
N 17:04 | Imperial Union League (diff | hist) . . (+13,568) . . Kef Drenall (talk | contribs) (Created page with "{{Youmay|Imperial Union League | Imperial Boloball (sport), or this league's predecessors: the Auvasa Imperial League and the Imperial Boloball League}} {|tab...") |
1 September 2024
m 19:32 | Elsyn Voss (diff | hist) . . (+664) . . Elsyn Voss (talk | contribs) (→Accolades) |
31 August 2024
m 17:12 | Vandor Vanguard (4 changes | history) . . (+1,944) . . [Kef Drenall (4×)] | |
m | 17:12 (cur | prev) . . (0) . . Kef Drenall (talk | contribs) (→Players & Staff) | |
m | 17:12 (cur | prev) . . (+1) . . Kef Drenall (talk | contribs) (→Players & Staff) | |
m | 17:00 (cur | prev) . . (+167) . . Kef Drenall (talk | contribs) (→Players & Staff) | |
m | 16:53 (cur | prev) . . (+1,776) . . Kef Drenall (talk | contribs) |
29 August 2024
Nm 21:26 | User talk:Irella Vuull (diff | hist) . . (+333) . . Navarro de Molay (talk | contribs) (Welcome!) |
26 August 2024
m 10:41 | Inwe Ventidius (2 changes | history) . . (-15) . . [Alani Myrtel (2×)] | |
m | 10:41 (cur | prev) . . (+56) . . Alani Myrtel (talk | contribs) (→Imperial Navy: link -> historical ranks in art subdomain) | |
m | 09:36 (cur | prev) . . (-71) . . Alani Myrtel (talk | contribs) (→Imperial Security Bureau Service Record: Fixed a few of the broken images, ranks in style of the already-present ones) |
22 August 2024
m 17:09 | Vandor Vanguard (diff | hist) . . (+435) . . Kef Drenall (talk | contribs) |
21 August 2024
19:29 | Vyna Shadows (5 changes | history) . . (+348) . . [Vyna Shadows (5×)] | |
19:29 (cur | prev) . . (+65) . . Vyna Shadows (talk | contribs) | ||
16:33 (cur | prev) . . (+167) . . Vyna Shadows (talk | contribs) (→Awards) | ||
16:29 (cur | prev) . . (+137) . . Vyna Shadows (talk | contribs) (→Imperial Service Record) | ||
16:23 (cur | prev) . . (+1) . . Vyna Shadows (talk | contribs) (→Storm Trooper Corps) | ||
16:23 (cur | prev) . . (-22) . . Vyna Shadows (talk | contribs) |
m 07:56 | Marcus Gabriel (diff | hist) . . (+764) . . Marcus Gabriel (talk | contribs) |
07:55 | Lepure Matasos (diff | hist) . . (+198) . . Lepure Matasos (talk | contribs) |
05:40 | Janus Wulff (diff | hist) . . (+453) . . Janus Wulff (talk | contribs) (→Awards) |