Welcome to the Imperial Archives! The main source of information in the Galactic Empire. Be sure to check out the Editing Protocol before making new pages or editing articles. If you need help feel free to contact the Archives manager at archives@swc-empire.com !
User contributions
(newest | oldest) View (newer 20 | older 20) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 04:19, 2 August 2020 (diff | hist) . . (-6) . . Corporate Oversector (→Command Staff)
- 04:18, 2 August 2020 (diff | hist) . . (-6) . . Amber Region
- 04:18, 2 August 2020 (diff | hist) . . (-6) . . Kuat Oversector (→Command Staff)
- 04:15, 2 August 2020 (diff | hist) . . (-5) . . Navy Command (Pre-Year 22) (→Other Members of Navy Command)
- 04:14, 2 August 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Navy Command (Pre-Year 22)
- 04:13, 2 August 2020 (diff | hist) . . (-10) . . 2nd Imperial Fleet
- 00:13, 28 July 2020 (diff | hist) . . (-68,163) . . Vidar Sicarius (Replaced content with "<center>https://i.imgur.com/PcsHr5y.png https://i.imgur.com/4HTvmsO.png </center>") (current)
- 01:11, 20 June 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+26) . . Vidar Sicarius
- 03:23, 29 October 2019 (diff | hist) . . (-75) . . Vidar Sicarius (→https://archives.swc-empire.com/images/mind.png Ministry of Industry)
- 03:04, 18 August 2019 (diff | hist) . . (+181) . . Vidar Sicarius
- 11:39, 5 July 2019 (diff | hist) . . (+362) . . Vidar Sicarius (→Imperial Personnel File)
- 11:21, 5 July 2019 (diff | hist) . . (+82) . . Vidar Sicarius (→Imperial Personnel File)
- 11:13, 5 July 2019 (diff | hist) . . (+91) . . Vidar Sicarius (→https://archives.swc-empire.com/images/navy.png Imperial Navy)
- 22:30, 15 June 2019 (diff | hist) . . (+280) . . Vidar Sicarius
- 05:36, 15 June 2019 (diff | hist) . . (+454) . . Vidar Sicarius
- 05:27, 15 June 2019 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Imperial Navy
- 05:26, 15 June 2019 (diff | hist) . . (+18) . . Imperial Navy
- 05:24, 15 June 2019 (diff | hist) . . (+5) . . Resource Allocation Division - Empire (→RAD-IN)
- 05:23, 15 June 2019 (diff | hist) . . (-2) . . Navy Command (Pre-Year 22) (→Other Members of Navy Command)
- 05:23, 15 June 2019 (diff | hist) . . (+126) . . Navy Command (Pre-Year 22)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 20 | older 20) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)